Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: AP-72,556    
AP-72,556
11/01/1996
Appeal Case Type
SALDANO, VICTOR AKA RODRIGUEZ, VICTOR 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/10/2007SUPP BR FILEDAppellant
12/12/2006BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
12/01/2006REPLY BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/03/2006BRIEF FILEDState
05/10/2006AMENDED BRIEF FILEDAppellant
04/05/2006BRIEF FILEDAppellant
01/08/2001BRIEF FILEDAssistant Attorney General
12/13/2000BRIEF FILEDAppellant
12/07/2000BRIEF FILEDState
12/01/2000BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
10/03/2000BRIEF FILEDState
10/02/2000BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
09/29/2000BRIEF FILEDAmicus Curiae
09/01/2000BRIEF FILEDAppellant
08/19/1998BRIEF FILEDState
02/06/1998BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/29/2009EXHIBITS RETURNED 
02/29/2008WRIT OF CERT USSCDENIED
10/31/2007ORDER RETURNED 
09/20/2007MANDATE ISSD 
08/22/2007REHEAR DISP – DPDENIED
07/06/2007REHEAR FILED DP 
06/14/2007REHEAR EXT MOTION DISP/NFEGranted
06/14/2007REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
06/06/2007OPINION ISSDAffirmed
01/10/2007SUPP BR FILED 
01/10/2007MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEFGranted
01/05/2007MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF 
12/13/2006SUBMITTED 
12/12/2006BRIEF RECEIVED 
12/06/2006MOTION DISPGranted
12/01/2006MOTION FILED 
12/01/2006REPLY BRIEF FILED 
11/27/2006MISC DOCUMENT RECD 
11/15/2006NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
11/09/2006NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
10/27/2006SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR APPEALS 
10/27/2006SET FOR SUBMIS 
10/03/2006BRIEF FILED 
10/03/2006MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITGranted
10/03/2006MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITFiled
08/08/2006EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
08/08/2006EXT BRIEF FILED 
05/23/2006EXHIBITS FILED 
05/10/2006EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
05/10/2006EXT BRIEF FILED 
05/10/2006AMENDED BRIEF FILED 
05/10/2006MOTION TO FILE AMENDED BRIEFGranted
05/04/2006MOTION TO FILE AMENDED BRIEFFiled
05/04/2006ORDER FILED 
05/04/2006SUPP RECORD MOT TOGranted
04/05/2006SUPP RECORD MOT TOFiled
04/05/2006BRIEF FILED 
11/07/2005EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
11/07/2005EXT BRIEF FILED 
10/07/2005REPORTERS RECORD FILED 
07/19/2005EXT RR DISP/NFEGranted
07/19/2005EXT RR FILED 
06/20/2005CLERK'S RECORD FILED 
03/22/2005EXT RR DISPGranted
03/22/2005EXT RR FILED 
01/12/2005TC APPT COUNSEL 
01/12/2005TC NOTICE RECEIVED 
01/12/2005REINSTATED - DP 
04/08/2002Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process 
04/08/2002MANDATE ISSD 
03/13/2002OPINION ISSDAffirmed
03/13/2002OPINION ISSDAffirmed
03/13/2002OPINION ISSDAffirmed
03/13/2002OPINION ISSDAffirmed
03/13/2002OPINION ISSDAffirmed
02/28/2001Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process 
02/28/2001ADDITIONAL LIST OF AUTHORITIES 
02/28/2001SUBMITTED 
02/13/2001NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
02/12/2001NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
02/05/2001NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/30/2001MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTGranted
01/29/2001MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT 
01/29/2001NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/26/2001NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/16/2001Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process 
01/16/2001SET FOR SUBMIS 
01/08/2001BRIEF FILED 
12/13/2000BRIEF FILED 
12/13/2000EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/13/2000EXT BRIEF FILED 
12/07/2000BRIEF FILED 
12/04/2000EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/01/2000BRIEF FILED 
11/28/2000EXT BRIEF FILED 
11/08/2000ORDER FILED 
10/03/2000BRIEF FILED 
10/02/2000BRIEF FILED 
09/29/2000BRIEF FILED 
09/01/2000BRIEF FILED 
07/31/2000REINSTATED DP 
07/31/2000REINSTATED 
07/24/2000MOTION FILED 
06/20/2000MOTION TO SUB COUNSEL - DISPGranted
06/20/2000MOTION TO SUB COUNSEL - FILED 
06/07/2000WRIT OF CERT USSCGranted
02/14/2000WRIT OF CERT USSCFiled
11/10/1999REHEAR DISPDENIED
11/10/1999Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process 
11/10/1999MANDATE ISSD 
11/10/1999REHEAR DISPDENIED
10/05/1999REHEAR FILED DP 
10/05/1999REHEAR FILED 
09/15/1999OPINION ISSDAffirmed
09/15/1999OPINION ISSDAffirmed
10/14/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process 
10/14/1998SUBMITTED 
10/05/1998NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
09/16/1998NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
08/26/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process 
08/26/1998SET FOR SUBMIS 
08/19/1998BRIEF FILED 
03/11/1998EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
03/11/1998EXT BRIEF FILED 
02/06/1998BRIEF FILED 
08/18/1997EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
08/18/1997EXT BRIEF FILED 
07/14/1997SF FILED DP 
07/01/1997APPT COUNSEL/ORDERGranted
04/28/1997EXT SF DISP/NFEGranted
04/25/1997EXT SF FILED 
03/24/1997TC NOTICE RECEIVED 
11/14/1996EXT SF DISP/NFEGranted
11/13/1996EXT SF FILED 
11/01/1996DP BEGIN 
11/01/1996DP BEGIN 
11/01/1996TRANSCRIPT FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/11/2007STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Roach
Matthew Paul
SALDANO, VICTOR AKA RODRIGUEZ,AppellantStanley G. Schneider
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
199th District Court 
Collin 
 
199-80049-96 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site