Case: 11-0589    
11-0589
07/29/2011
Mandamus/Cause
IN RE ALLCAT CLAIMS SERVICE, L.P. AND JOHN WEAKLY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Nikki Laing, CPA, et al. Submitted by Christopher S. Johns of Dawson & Sodd, LLP, 300 West 6th St., Suite 1950, Austin, TX 78701; (512)215-4078, (512)628-7169  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/08/2011Fully hyperlinked brief filedPlaintiff(s)(11) compact discs containing copies of the fully bookmarked and hyperlinked electronic version of Plaintiffs, Allcat Claims Service LP and John Weakly's REPLY Brief on the Merits.
10/24/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Tyson Hoffer, et al. Submitted by Juan F. Vasquez, Jr., Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams, and Aughtry, 1200 Smith St., 14th Flr., Houston, TX 77002, (713) 658-2553.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/18/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Amicus Brief of Texas Association of Realtors┬«.  Submitted by Tom Morgan; State Bar No. 24034115, 1115 San Jacinto Blvd., Suite 200, Austin, Texas 78701-1906, Telephone: (512) 480-8200.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/14/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Plaintiffs filed on behalf of Nikki Laing, et al. Submitted by Christopher S. Johns, Dawson & Sodd, LLP, 300 West 6th Street, Suite 1950, Austin, Texas 78701, (512) 215-4078. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/13/2011Reply BriefPlaintiff(s)E-FILED  Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Service, LP. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/12/2011Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedAmicus Curiae EFILED  on behalf of Texas Taxpayers and Research Association (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/07/2011Fully hyperlinked brief filedPlaintiff(s)(10) compact discs containing copies of the fully bookmarked and hyperlinked electronic version of Plaintiffs, Allcat Claims Service LP and John Weakly's' Brief on the Merits.
10/03/2011Brief on the MeritsDefendant(s)E-FILED  Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Combs, et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/12/2011Brief on the MeritsPlaintiff(s)E-FILED  Plaintiff's Brief on the merits filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Serv., LP. (HARD COPIES REC'D - APPENDIX IS SEPARATE)
08/22/2011Reply to ResponsePlaintiff(s)E-FILED  Reply to petition filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Service. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/18/2011Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledDefendant(s)E-FILED  Response to Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/29/2011Appendix FiledPlaintiff(s)appendix attached (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/29/2011Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorEFILED Orginal Petition filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Service, L.P. and John Weakly (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/20/2012Case Stored G02 Row 20 H-1 (2 vols)
01/12/2012Certified cys of cost bill sent to attys of record Cost Bill Issued
11/28/2011Concurring and Dissenting Opinion deliveredIssued 
11/28/2011Opinion issuedDenied 
11/14/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Nikki Laing, CPA, et al. Submitted by Christopher S. Johns of Dawson & Sodd, LLP, 300 West 6th St., Suite 1950, Austin, TX 78701; (512)215-4078, (512)628-7169  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/08/2011Fully hyperlinked brief filed (11) compact discs containing copies of the fully bookmarked and hyperlinked electronic version of Plaintiffs, Allcat Claims Service LP and John Weakly's REPLY Brief on the Merits.
10/24/2011Oral argument  argued on behalf of plaintiffs by James F. Martens; argued on behalf of defendants by Danica L. Milios; argued on behalf of amici curiae by Christopher S. Johns; time allotted to argue:  24/30/6 minutes
10/24/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Tyson Hoffer, et al. Submitted by Juan F. Vasquez, Jr., Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams, and Aughtry, 1200 Smith St., 14th Flr., Houston, TX 77002, (713) 658-2553.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/21/2011Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by Christopher S. Johns of Dawson & Sodd, LLP of Austin, TX
10/21/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to amicus attorney, Christopher S. Johns, to let him know the motion to participate in oral argument has been granted.  He will be sending a submission form today.
10/21/2011Motion to Argue disposedFiling granted Amici curiae Nikki Laing, CPA, et al.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court for Amici Curiae to Share Argument Time granted; Time allotted to argue:  24/30/6 minutes.
10/20/2011Motion to Argue filed E-FILED:  Amici curiae Nikki Laing, CPA, et al.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court for Amici Curiae to Share Argument Time.
10/20/2011Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted on behalf of plaintiffs by James F. Martens of Martens, Seay and Todd of Austin, TX
10/18/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED  Amicus Brief of Texas Association of Realtors┬«.  Submitted by Tom Morgan; State Bar No. 24034115, 1115 San Jacinto Blvd., Suite 200, Austin, Texas 78701-1906, Telephone: (512) 480-8200.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/14/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Plaintiffs filed on behalf of Nikki Laing, et al. Submitted by Christopher S. Johns, Dawson & Sodd, LLP, 300 West 6th Street, Suite 1950, Austin, Texas 78701, (512) 215-4078. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/13/2011Reply Brief E-FILED  Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Service, LP. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/12/2011Amicus Curiae Letter Received EFILED  on behalf of Texas Taxpayers and Research Association (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/10/2011Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by Danica L. Milios from the Office of the Attorney General of Texas of Austin, TX
10/07/2011Fully hyperlinked brief filed (10) compact discs containing copies of the fully bookmarked and hyperlinked electronic version of Plaintiffs, Allcat Claims Service LP and John Weakly's' Brief on the Merits.
10/06/2011Corrected Notice sent to all counsel Corrected due date for Plaintiff's Brief is October 13, 2011.
10/05/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedReply Brief is due October 13, 2011.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
10/05/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED  Unopposed motion for extention of time to file reply brief filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Service LP.
10/03/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED  Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Combs, et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/12/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED  Plaintiff's Brief on the merits filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Serv., LP. (HARD COPIES REC'D - APPENDIX IS SEPARATE)
09/09/2011Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentSet for oral argument on October 24, 2011; time allotted to argue:  30/30 minutes
09/09/2011Mandamus Set to Argue  
09/09/2011Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedCase set for oral argument 
08/26/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office To Mr. Marten's office in re:  2 copies of the letter of 8/25/11 in re:  conflicting dates for oral argument.  They will be sent out today.
08/25/2011Letter Filed E-FILED  Oral Argument conflict dates:  October 27th and 28th.  Filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Service, LP. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/22/2011Reply to Response E-FILED  Reply to petition filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Service. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/22/2011Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Plaintiff's brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 9/12/11; Defendant's brief due 10/3/11; Reply due 10/10/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  Briefs to address: i.Whether the grant of original jurisdiction in section 24 of HB 3 is valid under Article V, Section 3 of the Tx Constitution. ii.The merits of Claim 1 (Bullock Amendment). iii. Whether Claim 2 (Unequal Taxation) and Claim 3 (Attorney's Fees) are beyond the scope of the jurisdictional grant in section 24 of HB 3.
08/19/2011Call received From Ms. Lacy Leonard (Martens, Seay & Todd) attys for relators to inform the Court that they will be filing a reply to rlp's response to mandamus by 5 p.m. on Monday, Aug. 22nd.
08/19/2011Letter Filed E-FILED  Relators Allcat Claims Service LP, et al.'s Letter titled "Briefing and Discovery Schedule."  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/19/2011Letter Filed E-FILED  Real Parties in Interest Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas, et al.'s Letter titled as "Proposed Briefing Schedule."   HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
08/18/2011Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed E-FILED  Response to Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/03/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed motion for extension of time to file requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 8/19/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
08/02/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed motion for extension of time to file response filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Comptroller. (2)
07/29/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to Kevin Van Oort regarding filing of petition and request for response to petition due 8/8/11; emailed copy of petition and letter request.
07/29/2011Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 8/8/11; mailbox rule does not apply
07/29/2011Appendix Filed appendix attached (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/29/2011Petition for Writ of Mandamus EFILED Orginal Petition filed on behalf of Allcat Claims Service, L.P. and John Weakly (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/20/2012Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 20 H-1 (2 vols)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hoffer, TysonAmicus CuriaeMr. Juan F. Vasquez Jr.
Laing, C.P.A.Amicus CuriaeMr. Christopher S. Johns
Texas Association of Realtors®Amicus CuriaeMr. Thomas Jensen Morgan
Allcat Claims Service, L.P.Plaintiff(s)Mr. Michael Boydstun Seay
Mr. James F. Martens
Ms. Lacy L. Leonard
Ms. Amanda Marie Traphagan
Texas Taxpayers and Research AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. George S. Christian
Combs, SusanDefendant(s)Mr. Bill Davis
Mr. Kevin D. Van Oort
Mr. Jonathan F. Mitchell
Ms. Danica Lynn Milios
Mr. Daniel Tekstar Hodge
Mr. William J. "Bill" Cobb III
Attorney General Greg W. Abbott
Ms. Susan Combs
Mr. David C. Mattax
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
 
 
 
 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site