Supreme Court

Case: 08-0391    
08-0391
05/23/2008
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/30/2008Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledOther than Petitioner, Respondent, Relator etc.On behalf of Attorney ad Litem for a Child.  Submitted by attorney David Samuel Brown.
05/29/2008Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)On behalf of Barbara J. Elias-Perciful.  Submitted by Barbara J. Elias-Perciful; 3131 Turtle Creek Blvd, Suite 1018, Dallas, Texas 75219. Phone 214-522-7880. Fax 214-522-7887. (12)
05/29/2008Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus brief on behalf of the Attorneys ad litem for V.M.J., F.F.B., S.R., W.S.J., and E.E.B in support of relator.  Submitted by Jaanette Burney Sullivan; P.O. Box 18764, San Antonio, Texas 78218. Ph. 210-646-7150. (12)
05/29/2008Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledOther than Petitioner, Respondent, Relator etc.Response to mandamus. On behalf of Z.G.J. and J.S.J., Children at issue herein. (12)
05/29/2008Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to mandamus.  On behalf of Sara Steed, et al. (12)
05/29/2008Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus brief on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union & American Civil Liberties Union of Texas in opposition to rel's pet for writ of mandamus.  Submitted by Lisa Graybill; ACLU Foundation of Texas, P.O. Box 12905, Austin, Texas 78711.  Ph. 512-478-7300, Fx. 512-478-7303.
05/27/2008Surreply filedReal Parties in Interest Sur-Reply in Opposition to Stay Motion (12) filed on behalf of Sara Steed.
05/27/2008Amicus Curiae Letter Received Today the Supreme Court of Texas struck John X. Doe's Amicus Curiae Letter in the above-referenced case.  The letter violates Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 11 and 9.3(b).  If you wish to resubmit this document, please comply with Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 11 and 9.3(b).  Please Note that the Supreme Court does not accept fax filings.
05/23/2008Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)On behalf of Focus Now Texas.  Submitted by John X. Doe, Advocate.  No address listed.  Phone 641-715-39000x72780#.  Fax 916-415-3900.  Rec'd via fax.
05/23/2008Appendix Filed attached
05/23/2008Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorOn behalf of Texas Department of Family and Protective Services
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/16/2008Case Stored G02 Row 2 B-3
07/16/2008Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks Letter sent along with the record to the Court of Appeals
07/16/2008Record returned to Court of Appeals Per BH record returned to the 3rd Court of Appeals
05/30/2008Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed On behalf of Attorney ad Litem for a Child.  Submitted by attorney David Samuel Brown.
05/29/2008Amicus Curiae Brief received On behalf of Barbara J. Elias-Perciful.  Submitted by Barbara J. Elias-Perciful; 3131 Turtle Creek Blvd, Suite 1018, Dallas, Texas 75219. Phone 214-522-7880. Fax 214-522-7887. (12)
05/29/2008Concurring and Dissenting Opinion deliveredIssued 
05/29/2008Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedApplication denied with per curiam opinion 
05/29/2008Emergency stay disposedDeniedmotion for emergency relief denied
05/29/2008Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus brief on behalf of the Attorneys ad litem for V.M.J., F.F.B., S.R., W.S.J., and E.E.B in support of relator.  Submitted by Jaanette Burney Sullivan; P.O. Box 18764, San Antonio, Texas 78218. Ph. 210-646-7150. (12)
05/29/2008Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to mandamus. On behalf of Z.G.J. and J.S.J., Children at issue herein. (12)
05/29/2008Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to mandamus.  On behalf of Sara Steed, et al. (12)
05/29/2008Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus brief on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union & American Civil Liberties Union of Texas in opposition to rel's pet for writ of mandamus.  Submitted by Lisa Graybill; ACLU Foundation of Texas, P.O. Box 12905, Austin, Texas 78711.  Ph. 512-478-7300, Fx. 512-478-7303.
05/28/2008Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due n/l/t 9:00 a.m. on 5/29/08; mlbx rule d/n/a
05/28/2008Letter Filed Letter informing the Court that the 2nd COA case (03-08-00298-CV) had not been appealed to the to Court thus far.  Submitted by attorney David J. Schenck.
05/27/2008Reply to Response to Motion Reply to response to mo for emerg relief.  On behalf of TX Dept. of Family and Protective Services. (12)
05/27/2008Surreply filed Sur-Reply in Opposition to Stay Motion (12) filed on behalf of Sara Steed.
05/27/2008Letter Filed From attorney ad litem for E.K, B.K and J.K., Steven J. Wingard, to correct some misstatements contained in paragraph 9 of the Dept's brief
05/27/2008Phone call from Clerk's Office to Mr. David Schenck, counsel in the COA.  Re: to request hard copies of the letter he sent via fax. (letter state: that rels involved in a related case -- In re Bradshaw -- will oppose the motion)  Left message on Mr. Schenck's voicemail.
05/27/2008Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedFiled document is struck by the CourtToday the Supreme Court of Texas struck John X. Doe's Amicus Curiae Letter in the above-referenced case.  The letter violates Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 11 and 9.3(b).  If you wish to resubmit this document, please comply with Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 11 and 9.3(b).  Please Note that the Supreme Court does not accept fax filings.
05/23/2008Response to Motion filed Response to motion for emergency relief (on behalf of Sara Steed, et al.)
05/23/2008Amicus Curiae Letter Received On behalf of Focus Now Texas.  Submitted by John X. Doe, Advocate.  No address listed.  Phone 641-715-39000x72780#.  Fax 916-415-3900.  Rec'd via fax.
05/23/2008Case Record Filed  Record rec'd from 3rd Court of Appeals - Reporter's Record Vol. 1-7, Clerk's Record box
05/23/2008Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks Letter sent to Jeffrey Kyle of the Third Court of Appeals requesting that records and briefs filed in 03-08-00235-CV; In re Sara Steed, et al. and 03-08-00298-CV In re Louisa Bradshaw, et al. be tranferred to our Court
05/23/2008Motion for emergency stay filed motion for emergency relief on behalf of Tx DFPS
05/23/2008Appendix Filed attached
05/23/2008Petition for Writ of Mandamus On behalf of Texas Department of Family and Protective Services
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/16/2008Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 2 B-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American Civil Liberties UnionAmicus CuriaeMs. Lisa Shawn Graybill
Brown, David SamuelOther interested party Mr. David Samuel Brown
Elias-Perciful, Barbara J.Amicus CuriaeMs. Barbara J. Elias-Perciful
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesRelatorMr. Trevor Allen Woodruff
Mr. Carey D. Cockerell
Mr. Michael C. Shulman
Mr. Duke Elton Hooten
Keenum, DeborahOther interested party Ms. Deborah A. Keenum
Wingard, Steven J.Other interested party Mr. Steven James Wingard
Steed, SaraReal Party in Interest Ms. Amy Warr
Mr. Douglas W. Alexander
Mr. Robert W. Doggett
Ms. Amanda Jane Chisholm
Ms. Julie Michele Balovich
Sullivan, Jeanette BurneyAmicus CuriaeMrs. Jeanette B. Sullivan
Court of Appeals Information:
Conditionally Granted 
___ SW3d ___, 05-22-08 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Per Curiam 
Trial Court Information
51st District Court 
Schleicher 
Honorable Barbara Lane Walther 
2779-2903  
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site