Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00675-CV    
05-18-00675-CV
06/06/2018
Other Employment
Ruth Torres 
Dallas/Ft Worth International Airport, Marie Diaz, Mark Galvan, and Pursuit of Excellence, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/03/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
07/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
07/03/2018Letter brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/14/2018Corrected brief requested 
08/06/2018Appellants brief due 
08/03/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/31/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/25/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
07/25/2018Motion for rehearing denied 
07/25/2018Appellees brief due 
07/25/2018Appellants brief due 
07/23/2018Motion filed 
07/20/2018Motion to reconsider filed 
07/19/2018Letter filed 
07/17/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
07/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/11/2018Letter filed 
07/09/2018Motion to consolidate disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedStrike
07/05/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/03/2018Letter filed 
07/03/2018Letter brief filed 
07/03/2018Motion to consolidate filed 
07/03/2018Amended notice of appeal filed 
07/01/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/29/2018Motion to consolidate disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/28/2018No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
06/27/2018Letter filed 
06/27/2018Motion to consolidate filed 
06/22/2018Letter filed 
06/22/2018Letter filed 
06/22/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
06/21/2018No clerks record filed in civil case 
06/21/2018No reporters record filed in civil case 
06/18/2018Docketing statement filed 
06/18/2018Notice filed 
06/16/2018Record due 
06/15/2018Letter received 
06/15/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/13/2018Motion for emergency relief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/12/2018Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals 
06/12/2018Motion for emergency relief filed 
06/08/2018Fee requested 
06/08/2018Docketing statement due 
06/08/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
06/06/2018Case began in court of appeals 
06/06/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
06/04/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge 
05/17/2018Motion to reconsider filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/24/2018StatusAmended brief due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dallas/Ft Worth International AirportAppelleeC. John Scheef III
Harold Dean Jones
Henry Wehrmann  
Anna S. Brooks
Brandy K. Chambers
Marie Diaz, Mark Galvan, and Pursuit of Excellence, Inc.AppelleeAndrea Kelly Bouressa  
Byron Kevin Henry  
Torres, Ruth AppellantRuth Torres
Trial Court Information
44th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Bonnie L. Goldstein 
DC-16-08711 
David Langford 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site