Fourth Court of Appeals

Case: 04-16-00641-CV    
04-16-00641-CV
10/04/2016
Interlocutory
In the Estate of Jack C. Gilbert, Jr., Deceased 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/07/2016Amended brief filedAppellant
12/07/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
11/18/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
11/02/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/19/2017Mandate issued 
02/08/2017Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/22/2016Order entered 
12/22/2016Motion to file amended brief disposedGrant motion
12/21/2016Submitted 
12/07/2016Amended brief filed 
12/07/2016Motion to file amended brief filed 
12/07/2016Reply brief filed 
11/30/2016Set for submission on briefs 
11/21/2016Case ready to be set 
11/18/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/17/2016Prescreened 
11/02/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/19/2016Internal memo 
10/18/2016Clerks record filed 
10/14/2016Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
10/13/2016Order entered 
10/13/2016Motion for emergency relief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/12/2016Reporters record filed 
10/07/2016Notice of appeal received 
10/05/2016Letter filed 
10/05/2016Docketing statement filed 
10/05/2016Letter filed 
10/04/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
10/04/2016Motion for emergency relief filed 
10/04/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
10/04/2016Case began in court of appeals 
09/29/2016Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/19/2017Case StoredCase stored
04/19/2023RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gilbert, James C.AppelleeKurtis S. Rudkin
Sundin, Trudy Jane SchuetzeAppellantShannon K. Dunn
Beth Watkins
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law 
Kendall 
Honorable Stephen B. Ables 
16-048-PR 
Dandy Middleton 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site