First Court of Appeals

Case: 01-17-00493-CV    
01-17-00493-CV
07/03/2017
Governmental Immunity
Jefferson County, Texas 
Ellarene Farris, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Heirs and Estate of James Farris 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
Thomson/West 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/18/2018Supplemental brief filedAppellant
04/02/2018Reply brief filedAppellee
02/12/2018Supplemental brief filedAppellant
11/15/2017Post submission brief filedAppellant
10/25/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
09/15/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
07/25/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/2018Motion for rehearing en banc filed 
10/12/2018Motion for rehearing due 
09/27/2018Order enteredGrant motion in part and deny motion in part
09/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
09/17/2018Motion for rehearing due 
08/31/2018Opinion issuedVacate TC judgment and dismiss case
08/31/2018Opinion issuedOpinion dissenting to this Court's judgment
08/31/2018Judgment Issued 
04/18/2018Supplemental brief filed 
04/02/2018Reply brief filed 
04/02/2018Response due 
03/01/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/2018Supplemental brief filed 
02/12/2018Motion to file supplemental brief filed 
11/22/2017Response filed 
11/22/2017Response filed 
11/22/2017Response filed 
11/20/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
11/15/2017Post submission brief filed 
11/15/2017Motion for leave filed 
11/08/2017Submitted 
10/25/2017Letter filed 
10/25/2017Reply brief filed 
10/25/2017Reply brief due 
10/20/2017Document filed 
10/06/2017Letter filed 
10/05/2017Set for submission on oral argument 
10/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/2017Reply brief due 
10/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/15/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/15/2017Case ready to be set 
09/15/2017Appearance of counsel 
09/15/2017Appellees brief due 
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/05/2017Appellees brief due 
08/24/2017Appellees brief due 
08/22/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
08/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/14/2017Appellees brief due 
08/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/01/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
08/01/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
07/26/2017Court fee due 
07/26/2017Docketing statement due 
07/25/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/24/2017Response due 
07/14/2017Clerks record filed 
07/14/2017No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
07/14/2017Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
07/13/2017Record due 
07/12/2017Fee paid 
07/07/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/03/2017Case began in court of appeals 
07/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
07/03/2017Notice of appeal received 
06/16/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/2018MotionMotion for rehearing en banc
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jefferson County, Texas AppellantQuentin Dean Price
Kathleen Marie Kennedy
Ellarene Farris, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Heirs and Estate of James Farris AppelleeAaron Heckaman
Justin Jenson
Jason Kyle Beale
Trial Court Information
11th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge 11th District Court 
2005-09580 
Court Reporter 11th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site