First Court of Appeals

Case: 01-17-00488-CV    
01-17-00488-CV
06/30/2017
Real Property
Robert Gulledge and Diana Gulledge 
Warren Wester and Theodore Sullivan 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
Thomson/West 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/08/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
12/15/2017Amended brief filedAppellant
12/14/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/15/2018Fee paid 
10/12/2018Motion for rehearing en banc filed 
10/12/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
10/01/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed 
10/01/2018Motion for rehearing due 
09/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
09/26/2018Motion for rehearing due 
09/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
09/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
09/12/2018Motion for rehearing due 
08/28/2018Opinion issuedReverse TC judgment and render judgment
08/28/2018Judgment Issued 
08/28/2018Opinion issuedOpinion concurring with this Court's judgment
08/05/2018Notice filed 
07/25/2018Exhibits filed 
07/25/2018Exhibits due 
07/18/2018Order enteredIssue sua sponte order
05/25/2018Exhibits due 
05/17/2018Exhibits filed 
05/15/2018Order enteredIssue sua sponte order
05/08/2018Submitted 
04/13/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
02/28/2018Reply brief due 
02/16/2018Supplemental clerks record filed 
02/09/2018Appellees brief due 
02/08/2018Document filed 
02/08/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/08/2018Case ready to be set 
01/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/30/2018Appellees brief due 
01/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/16/2018Appellees brief due 
12/21/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/2017Motion to file amended brief filed 
12/15/2017Amended brief filed 
12/14/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/14/2017Appellants brief due 
12/06/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/15/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
11/10/2017Document filed 
10/30/2017Appellants brief due 
10/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/29/2017Reporters record filed 
09/29/2017Reporters record due 
09/20/2017Record due 
09/19/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/19/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/04/2017Clerks record filed 
07/28/2017Letter received 
07/25/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/25/2017Court fee due 
07/25/2017Docketing statement due 
07/19/2017Fee paid 
07/18/2017Appearance of counsel 
07/12/2017Court reporters information sheet sent 
06/30/2017Case began in court of appeals 
06/30/2017Notice of appeal received 
06/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
06/22/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
05/23/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/2018Appeal to Higher CourtPetition for review due in Supreme Court
10/12/2018MotionMotion for rehearing
10/12/2018MotionMotion for rehearing en banc
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Gulledge Family Living Trust AppellantTimothy A. Beeton
Sullivan, TheodoreAppellantGeorge W. Vie III
Robert and Diana GulledgeAppellantStakely McConnell
Timothy A. Beeton
Wester, Warren AppelleeChristin L. Grant
David M. Feldman
Cristen David Feldman
George W. Vie III
Trial Court Information
10th District Court 
Galveston 
Honorable Judge 10th District Court 
16-CV-1022 
Gail Jalufka 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site